Charette, Marie-Christine Isabelle (CPSO#: 86247)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MCI Charette Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Charette ( CPSO# 86247 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Medical Records Location

Address: Montford Hospital 713 Montreal Rd Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018