Chari, Rachna Alamelu (CPSO#: 91166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
171 East Liberty St
Unit 102
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R1B5
Canada
Phone: 6479384384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachna Chari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chari ( CPSO# 91166 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre at SJHC
30 The Queensway
Suite 1 East
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Business Address:
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Business Address:
4 - 8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHNA ALAMELU CHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 02 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011