Charlton, Kenneth James (CPSO#: 62220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Western University
1151 Richmond St.
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 217
475 Talbot st.
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Charlton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Charlton ( CPSO# 62220 )

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Student Health Services
1151 Richmond Street
UCC Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JAMES CHARLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991