Charman, Sandra Marcela (CPSO#: 89743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2079 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7R 1E2
Phone: (905) 634-1625
Fax: (905) 634-5332
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA MARCELA CHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010