Chartier, Lucas (CPSO#: 91035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St.
Fell Pavilion, 1st floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5801
Fax: 416-340-4300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Suite 1NW-126
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Fax: (416) 756-6151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chartier & Lapointe-Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chartier ( CPSO# 91035 )
Dr. L. Lapointe-Shaw ( CPSO# 91040 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
14 Eaton North - 213
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Business Address:
Suite FP 1-503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
Suite 1NW-126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS CHARTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014