Chase, Teena Darlene (CPSO#: 97672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2018

Expiry Date:  26 Feb 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean (Ottawa)
Nepean ON  K2H8P4
Phone: 613 721 4708
Fax: 613 721 4773
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3500 Fallowfield Rd
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Feb 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Teena  Darlene  Chase  may practise psychiatry at Queensway Carleton
                  Hospital and Greenbelt Family Health Team in Nepean, Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  on  February 26,
                  2021  or  when  Dr.  Chase's  eligibility  to  take the Royal College  of
                  Physicians  and Surgeons of Canada examination expires,  whichever  comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Chase's knowledge, skill, judgment  or  attitude,  does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to the College by the due date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Chase's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  February  27,  2018, and will expire on or
                  before February 26, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.