Chasen, Martin Robert (CPSO#: 92146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, French

Education:University of Pretoria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50532
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Division Palliative care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1N 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 70185
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Chasen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chasen ( CPSO# 92146 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (647) 822-1933

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (647) 822-1933

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 18 Nov 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ROBERT CHASEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014