Chatrath, Vikram (CPSO#: 92731)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ravi Shankar University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2010 to 20 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2010 to 31 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012