Chatterjee, Suman (CPSO#: 81386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 595-1586
Fax: (905) 595-0446
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chatterjee, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 66284 )
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 81386 )

Business Address:
247 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-1586


Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 84426 )
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 66284 )
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 81386 )

Business Address:
Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-1586


Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 84426 )
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 81386 )

Business Address:
Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-1587

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMAN CHATTERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2010