Chaturvedi, Swasti (CPSO#: 89501)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kanpur University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011