Chau, James Tak On (CPSO#: 73662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North East Specialized
Geriatric Centre
960 D Nortre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 688-3970
Fax: (705) 688-7720
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kirkwood Place, NBRHC
680 Kirkwood Drive, Cottage #3
Behaviour Supports Ontario
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James T. O. Chau and Dr. Christine W. Pun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pun ( CPSO# 76863 )
Dr. J. Chau ( CPSO# 73662 )

Business Address:
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit D
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 688-3970

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4700

Business Address:
680 Kirkwood Drive
Suite 3
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES TAK ON CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2002