Chaudhry, Harman Preet (CPSO#: 96236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - University Hospital
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMAN PREET CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2017