Chaudhry, Salman Rafat (CPSO#: 91255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
55 Frid St
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone: 9055292259
Fax: 9055292262
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Lung Care Clinic
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M2K2W2
Canada
Phone: 4162292315
Fax: 4162239828
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

282 Linwell Road
Suite 118
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 646-8582
Fax: (905) 529-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salman Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 91255 )

Business Address:
7 - 55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
204 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 229-2315

Business Address:
118 - 282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 646-8582

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMAN RAFAT CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015