Chaudry, Gulraiz Ahmed (CPSO#: 81635)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006