Chauhan, Amitabh (CPSO#: 93634)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018