Chauhan, Nitin (CPSO#: 84878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Head & Neck Clinic
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Otolaryngology Clinic
Room 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L6
Canada
Phone: (647) 748-2999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Main Healthcare
3rd Floor
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nitin Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chauhan ( CPSO# 84878 )

Business Address:
Main Healthcare
Suite 301
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
Suite 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
4515 Ebenezer Road
Suite 114
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 799-9969

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NITIN CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011