Chauhan, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 84806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
3rd floor, D324, forensic dept
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39554
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
3G, third floor
Child and Youth Mental Health Unit
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 72800
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chauhan ( CPSO# 84806 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
D324 Forensic Department, 3rd Floor
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Psych & Behavioural Neuroscience
3G - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013