Chawla, Arun Kumar (CPSO#: 83523)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 18 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006