Chawla, Punkuj (CPSO#: 80207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Benrose Health Centre
357 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1A2
Phone: (519) 601-5841
Fax: (519) 601-9293
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punkuj Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chawla ( CPSO# 80207 )

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
357 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 601-5841

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNKUJ CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2003 to 21 Oct 2003
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2003 to 16 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2007 to 26 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005