Cheema, Amarpreet Singh (CPSO#: 83915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

270 Carling Terrace
ER Dept
Wingham ON  N0G2W0
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amarpreet Singh Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheema ( CPSO# 83915 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 15, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Amarpreet Singh
            Cheema in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cheema to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. AMARPREET SINGH CHEEMA
                                          ("Dr. Cheema")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cheema, certificate of registration number 83915, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 107044 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING


            (5)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) to twenty (20) of my patient
                              charts at every meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s) including, but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.

                  (e)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in:
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    patient interactions; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months of the date that I execute this Undertaking or, if no
                        satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Cheema, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the Public Register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.

            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cheema, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cheema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cheema, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Cheema
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of family medicine. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Cheema will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                    twelve months.
                  
                                    Dr. Cheema will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record keeping and patient interactions.
                  
                                    Dr. Cheema's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Cheema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Cheema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Cheema, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Amarpreet Singh Cheema to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 15, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Cheema engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Cheema will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months.

Dr. Cheema will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and patient interactions.

Dr. Cheema’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.