Cheema, Asim Nazir (CPSO#: 73132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
113-1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (416) 620-9600
Fax: (416) 620-9620
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 620-9600
Fax: (416) 620-9620
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5B1J2
Canada
Phone: 416-620-9600
Fax: 416-620-9620
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 4166209600
Fax: 4166209620
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheema ( CPSO# 73132 )

Business Address:
10 Lower Harvis Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 620-9600

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 620-9600

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 620-9600

Business Address:
113 - 1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (416) 620-9600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIM NAZIR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Nov 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2001