Cheema, Mandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 96011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's Health In Women's Hands CHC
2 Carlton Street, Suite #500
Toronto ON  M5B 1J3
Phone: 416-593-7655
Fax: 416-848-6265
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bellwood Health Services
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5
Canada
Phone: 416-495-0926
Fax: 416-495-1634
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Casey House
119 Isabella Street
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2
Toronto ON  M4Y 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 962-7600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bellwood Health Services Inc. Toronto
Casey House Hospice Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013