Cheema, Sohail Ehsan (CPSO#: 76906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9-7990
KENNEDY ROAD SOUTH
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 455-5445
Fax: (905) 455-5665
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

16-2555
ERIN CENTER BLVD.
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-0270
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charoilois Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Derry Village Clinic
Unit 2-4
7070 St Barbra Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 565-9100
Fax: (905) 565-8973
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 9 2007


Corporation Name: Sohail Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheema ( CPSO# 76906 )

Business Address:
Derry Village Clinic
Suite 2-4
7070 St Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 565-9100

Business Address:
Kennedy Medical Clinic
9 - 7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445

Business Address:
16 - 2555 Erin Center
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0270

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charlois Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 454-3347

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sohail  Ehsan  Cheema  may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
            only.