Cheema, Waqar Mustafa (CPSO#: 82070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3 - 511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON  L6Y 0N2
Phone: 9054507427
Fax: 9054502535
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8730 The Gore Road
Brampton ON  L6P 0B1
Canada
Phone: (647) 557-2232
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Canada
Phone: (416) 361-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 10
17 Raylawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 5L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 497-7475
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waqar Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )

Business Address:
Suite 3
511 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 450-7427

Business Address:
Suite 10
17 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 450-7472

Business Address:
8730 The Gore Road
Brampton ON  L6B 0B1


Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )
Dr. J. Gupta ( CPSO# 82857 )

Business Address:
Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Basement Level
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000


Corporation Name: Doctors Aziz, Cheema, and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2018


Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain ( CPSO# 102276)
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )

Business Address:
Legacy Cloud Medical Clinic
Unit 4
2035 Sheppard Avenue
North York ON  M2J 0A8
Phone Number: (647) 351-1411

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAQAR MUSTAFA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2007