Chehadi, Abdel-Kareem (CPSO#: 91070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10-1320 Concordia Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3W 0C6
Phone: (204) 942-2234
Fax: (204) 942-8487

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDEL-KAREEM CHEHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEHADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2018