Cheifetz, Arielle (CPSO#: 93203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Cheifetz, Arielle Emma Cohen (used until: 01 May 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2N1
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Fax: (416) 470-6691
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arielle Cheifetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheifetz ( CPSO# 93203 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2N1
Phone Number: (416) 470-6690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIELLE CHEIFETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEIFETZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012