Chelvanathan, Anjala (CPSO#: 84320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Corcare
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anjala Chelvanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chelvanathan ( CPSO# 84320 )

Business Address:
Corcare
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 274-4844

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJALA CHELVANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHELVANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011