Chemwolo, Benjamin Tanui (CPSO#: 95019)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Nairobi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 10 Jun 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011