Chen, Anna Pan (CPSO#: 90734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
502-245 Fairview Mall Dr.
Toronto ON  M2J 4T1
Phone: (647) 648-6095
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Seneca College Health Centre
1750 Finch Ave East
Toronto ON  M2J 2X5
Canada
Phone: 416-491-5050 Ext. 22965
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

265 Yorkland Blvd
Unit 403
Toronto ON  M2J 5C7
Canada
Phone: 416-229-2399
Fax: 416-229-9771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA PAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 20 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015