Chen, Betty Hsun-Ju (CPSO#: 70541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
76 Grenville Street
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. 1-1
Fax: (416) 323-6350
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY HSUN-JU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1998