Chen, Charissa Chieh-Hwei (CPSO#: 109764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: 416-323-6060
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARISSA CHIEH-HWEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018