Chen, Dean Li-Hsiang (CPSO#: 74014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 778-1212
Fax: (416) 778-1216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dean Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chen ( CPSO# 74014 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 778-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN LI-HSIANG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2003