Chen, Ing Je (CPSO#: 98106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marklandwood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone: (416) 695-8878
Fax: (416) 695-2622
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chen ( CPSO# 98106 )

Business Address:
Marklandwood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 695-8878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ING JE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014