Chen, Jerry Yeou-Wei (CPSO#: 97572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NeuroCare Neurology Neurophysiology
1110 Sheppard Ave E, Suite 402
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035232
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY YEOU-WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017