Chen, Jeyla Xiao Meng (CPSO#: 95096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 782-4447
Fax: (416) 782-1284
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unison Health & Community Services
1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 653-5400
Fax: (416) 657-3622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeyla Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chen ( CPSO# 95096 )

Business Address:
Unison Health and Community Services
1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 653-5400

Business Address:
Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEYLA XIAO MENG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013