Chen, Kuan-Chin Jean (CPSO#: 93224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chen ( CPSO# 93224 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUAN-CHIN JEAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 08 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013