Chen, Shin-Yee (CPSO#: 82282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen ( CPSO# 82282 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Cardio Respiratory Unit
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (613) 513-8579

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIN-YEE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 30 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009