Chen, Yan (CPSO#: 94004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Darien Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Microbiology Department Room 3G101
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yan Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chen ( CPSO# 94004 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Microbiology Department
Room 3G101
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017