Chen, Yung-Siang (CPSO#: 24123)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Indonesian

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yung Siang Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chen ( CPSO# 24123 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 792-1010

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 25 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018