Cheng, Albert Sau-Shan (CPSO#: 73994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B1 Clinics
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Fax: (416) 285-3764
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 5300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng ( CPSO# 73994 )

Business Address:
B1 Clinics
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3619

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 27 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT SAU-SHAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005