Cheng, Alex Won-Pang (CPSO#: 95692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Won-Pang Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng ( CPSO# 95692 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX WON-PANG CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013