Cheng, Alice Yuk-Yan (CPSO#: 72291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-7622
Fax: (905) 828-7769
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

420 Highway 7 East, Unit 27
Markham ON  L4B 3K2
Canada
Phone: (905) 695-1133
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

61 Queen Street East
7th floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: 416-867-7424
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alice Yuk-Yan Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng ( CPSO# 72291 )

Business Address:
507 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-7622

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
27-420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE YUK-YAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002