Cheng, Catherine Fung-Mann (CPSO#: 113699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2019

Expiry Date:  11 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Aug 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4663
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE FUNG-MANN CHENG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHENG is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHENG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHENG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHENG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHENG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHENG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 11 Jan 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2018 to 11 Jan 2019
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019