Cheng, Chiachen (CPSO#: 71164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sister Margaret Smith Centre
St Josephs Care Group
Mental Health & Addictions Programs
301 North Lillie St
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6
Phone: (807) 684-5100
Fax: (807) 622-1779
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807 346-1440
Fax: 807 346-1445
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harris and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheng ( CPSO# 71164 )
Dr. W. Harris ( CPSO# 71388 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
984 Oilver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1440

Business Address:
301 North Lillie Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIACHEN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002