Cheng, Vincent (CPSO#: 60982)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Oct 2006
Summary:

 On October 19, 2006, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Cheng(s admission and found that he 
 commited acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard practice of 
 the profession and that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Therefore, the Discipline Commitee ordered and 
 directed that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Cheng(s certificate of registration, effective 
 immediately.

2.	Dr. Cheng pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.

3.	The results of 
 this proceeding be included on the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 19, 2006