Cherian, Naomi (CPSO#: 111946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto Western Hospital
8Ew - 432E
399 Bathrust St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Sep 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018