Cherian, Shiny Rachael (CPSO#: 70289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Benin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Massey Medical Clinic
P O Box 119
260 Cameron Street
Massey ON  P0P 1P0
Phone: (705) 865-2300
Fax: (705) 865-3495
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rachael Cherian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cherian ( CPSO# 70289 )

Business Address:
Massey Medical Clinic
PO Box 119
260 Cameron Street
Massey ON  P0P 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 865-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHINY RACHAEL CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998