Cherney, Olga Hanna (CPSO#: 76715)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O.H.Cherney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2017