Cherry, Paul Martin Hempsall (CPSO#: 28474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1976

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 481-5189
Fax: (416) 481-5189
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 701
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 968-3215
Fax: (416) 968-3215
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MARTIN HEMPSALL CHERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)