Chessex, Caroline (CPSO#: 72170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5516
Fax: (416) 603-5274
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Chessex Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chessex ( CPSO# 72170 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5516

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE CHESSEX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESSEX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002